ID H0486 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - to Health/Wel
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-21 - to Health/Wel
Pending: Senate Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law to prohibit the use of a phototherapy device, tanning device or ultraviolet tanning device on minors with an exception and to provide penalties.
Title
Adds to existing law to prohibit the use of a phototherapy device, tanning device or ultraviolet tanning device on minors with an exception and to provide penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 39 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-21 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-03-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-21 | Senate intro | |
2012-03-20 | to Senate | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | Rusche | |
2012-03-20 | 39-30-1 AYES -- Bateman, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Block(Block), Bolz, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Cronin, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Hagedorn, Hartgen, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, McGeachin, Nesset, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Shirley, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Trail, Wills, Wood(27) NAYS -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Batt, Bayer, Black, Boyle, Collins, Crane, DeMordaunt, Guthrie, Hart, Harwood, Henderson, Luker, Marriott, McMillan, Moyle, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Schaefer, Shepherd, Simpson, Sims, Thayn, Thompson, Vander Woude, Mr. Speaker Absent and excused -- Wood(35) Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-20 | PASSED | |
2012-03-20 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-20 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-20 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-19 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-19 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-19 | to engros | |
2012-03-19 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-13 | To Gen Ord | |
2012-03-12 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt out w/o amen | |
2012-03-07 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-03-07 | Rpt out | |
2012-03-01 | 3rd rdg as amen -- Ret'd to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-28 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-28 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-02-27 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-27 | Rpt engros | |
2012-02-24 | to engros | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-02-21 | to Gen Ord | |
2012-02-21 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-08 | to Health/Wel | |
2012-02-08 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-07 | to printing | |
2012-02-07 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-07 | House intro |