ID H0467 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2014 Session Law Chapter 104 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2014 Session Law Chapter 104 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to provide that certain controlled hunt permits may also be issued for bear and turkey; and to provide that wildlife subject to special depredation hunts shall include bear and turkey.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that certain controlled hunt permits may also be issued for bear and turkey; and to provide that wildlife subject to special depredation hunts shall include bear and turkey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2014 Session Law Chapter 104 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-13 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:40 a.m. on March 12, 2014 |
2014-03-12 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-10 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-10 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-03-07 | Senate | to House |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-03-07 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-21 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-21 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-21 | House | PASSED -- 62-0-8 |
2014-02-21 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-20 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2014-02-19 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-18 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |