ID H0465 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 63 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-14 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 63 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to public works contractors licenses to revise the number of classes of licenses, to revise a license fee and to provide provisions relating to a class "CC" license and related fees.
Title
Amends existing law relating to public works contractors licenses to revise the number of classes of licenses, to revise a license fee and to provide provisions relating to a class "CC" license and related fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-28 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-14 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 63 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-13 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/12 | |
2012-03-12 | To Governor | |
2012-03-09 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-08 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-08 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-07 | To enrol | |
2012-03-06 | to House | |
2012-03-06 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-06 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2012-03-05 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-03-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-02 | rec d/p | |
2012-03-02 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-29 | to Com/HuRes | |
2012-02-29 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-29 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-28 | to Senate | |
2012-02-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-28 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2012-02-27 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-27 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-24 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-03 | to Bus | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-02 | to printing | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | House intro |