ID H0455 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 45 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-08 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 45 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to divorce actions; to delete provisions prohibiting a certain retainer and to revise language relating to certain fees and costs of the parenting coordinator.
Title
Amends existing law relating to divorce actions; to delete provisions prohibiting a certain retainer and to revise language relating to certain fees and costs of the parenting coordinator.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-02-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-08 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 45 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-06 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/05 | |
2012-03-05 | To Governor | |
2012-03-02 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-01 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-01 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-02-29 | To enrol | |
2012-02-28 | to House | |
2012-02-28 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-28 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-1 | |
2012-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-15 | to Jud | |
2012-02-15 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-15 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-14 | to Senate | |
2012-02-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2012-02-13 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-03 | to Jud | |
2012-02-03 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-02 | to printing | |
2012-02-02 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-02 | House intro |