ID H0452 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2024 Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-08 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2024 Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 07/01/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
EDUCATION -- Amends existing law to change the distribution amount for the Idaho Digital Learning Academy funding and to revise certain requirements regarding funding and distributions.
Title
Amends existing law to change the distribution amount for the Idaho Digital Learning Academy funding and to revise certain requirements regarding funding and distributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-08 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 7, 2024 Session Law Chapter 17 Effective: 07/01/2024 |
2024-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:15 a.m. on March 5, 2024 |
2024-03-05 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2024-03-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2024-03-01 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2024-02-29 | Senate | to House |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Title apvd |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 34-1-0 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Education |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2024-02-09 | House | to Senate |
2024-02-09 | House | Title apvd |
2024-02-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-1-5 |
2024-02-08 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2024-02-01 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Education |
2024-01-31 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |