ID H0450 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 160 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-27 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 160 Effective: 07/01/12
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends and adds to existing law relating to alcoholic beverages to create the Alcohol Beverage Control Fund, to provide moneys for the Alcohol Beverage Control Fund, to provide that expenditures from such fund shall be subject to legislative appropriation, to provide for the transfer of certain excess moneys to the General Fund and to specify that other certain moneys shall be deposited in the General Fund; and to provide that certain moneys collected by the director of the Idaho State Police shall be deposited in the Alcohol Beverage Control Fund and other certain moneys shall be deposited in the General Fund.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law relating to alcoholic beverages to create the Alcohol Beverage Control Fund, to provide moneys for the Alcohol Beverage Control Fund, to provide that expenditures from such fund shall be subject to legislative appropriation, to provide for the transfer of certain excess moneys to the General Fund and to specify that other certain moneys shall be deposited in the General Fund; and to provide that certain moneys collected by the director of the Idaho State Police shall be deposited in the Alcohol Beverage Control Fund and other certain moneys shall be deposited in the General Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 160 Effective: 07/01/12 | |
2012-03-23 | Rpt delivered to Governor on 03/22 | |
2012-03-22 | To Governor | |
2012-03-21 | Pres signed | |
2012-03-21 | Sp signed | |
2012-03-21 | Rpt enrol | |
2012-03-20 | to enrol | |
2012-03-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-20 | 3rd rdg as amen -- PASSED -- 44-21-5 | |
2012-03-19 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-19 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-16 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-16 | Rpt engros | |
2012-03-15 | to engros | |
2012-03-15 | House concurred in Senate amens | |
2012-03-15 | House Held at Desk | |
2012-03-14 | to House | |
2012-03-14 | Title apvd | |
2012-03-14 | McKenzie | |
2012-03-14 | 32-1-2 AYES -- Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Johnson, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McKague, McKenzie, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Rice, Siddoway, Smyser, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Schmidt Absent and excused -- Andreason, Pearce Floor Sponsor | |
2012-03-14 | PASSED | |
2012-03-14 | Rls susp | |
2012-03-14 | to 3rd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-03-13 | to 2nd rdg as amen | |
2012-03-13 | 1st rdg | |
2012-03-12 | to 1st rdg as amen | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt out amen | |
2012-03-12 | to 14th Ord | |
2012-03-12 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-21 | to St Aff | |
2012-02-21 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-21 | Senate intro | |
2012-02-20 | to Senate | |
2012-02-20 | Title apvd | |
2012-02-20 | Perry & Jaquet | |
2012-02-20 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 57-11-2 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barrett, Bateman, Batt, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chadderdon, Chew, Collins, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs, Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, McGeachin, McMillan, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Shirley, Simpson, Smith(30), Smith(24), Thayn, Trail, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Barbieri, Bayer, Boyle, Crane, Marriott, Moyle, Palmer, Schaefer, Shepherd, Sims, Thompson Absent and excused -- Stevenson Excused from voting -- Vander Woude Floor Sponsors | |
2012-02-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2012-02-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | to 2nd rdg | |
2012-02-13 | rec d/p | |
2012-02-13 | Rpt out | |
2012-02-02 | to Jud | |
2012-02-02 | Rpt prt | |
2012-02-01 | to printing | |
2012-02-01 | 1st rdg | |
2012-02-01 | House intro |