ID H0412 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 20 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on February 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-26 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 20 Effective: 07/01/10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to administrative rules to provide for electronic publication of the Idaho Administrative Code; to provide for electronic copies of the Administrative Code, to revise language relating to the format, costs, and distribution of such code, to revise language relating to certain fees; and to revise language relating to an exemption from certain requirements of Idaho Code.
Title
Amends existing law relating to administrative rules to provide for electronic publication of the Idaho Administrative Code; to provide for electronic copies of the Administrative Code, to revise language relating to the format, costs, and distribution of such code, to revise language relating to certain fees; and to revise language relating to an exemption from certain requirements of Idaho Code.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-26 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 20 Effective: 07/01/10 | |
2010-02-24 | To Governor | |
2010-02-23 | Pres signed | |
2010-02-22 | Sp signed | |
2010-02-22 | Rpt enrol | |
2010-02-19 | To enrol | |
2010-02-18 | to House | |
2010-02-18 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-0-2 | |
2010-02-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2010-02-08 | to St Aff | |
2010-02-08 | 1st rdg | |
2010-02-08 | Senate intro | |
2010-02-05 | to Senate | |
2010-02-05 | Title apvd | |
2010-02-05 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2010-02-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2010-02-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2010-02-03 | rec d/p | |
2010-02-03 | Rpt out | |
2010-01-26 | to St Aff | |
2010-01-26 | Rpt prt | |
2010-01-25 | to printing | |
2010-01-25 | 1st rdg | |
2010-01-25 | House intro |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0412.htm |
Text | http://www.legislature.idaho.gov/legislation/2010/H0412.pdf |