ID H0404 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2014 Session Law Chapter 63 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2014 Session Law Chapter 63 Effective: 07/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise definitions; to revise provisions relating to a state approved ignition interlock system, to revise provisions relating to an alcohol evaluation; to revise provisions relating to a court order and to revise provisions relating to a calibration.
Title
Amends existing law to revise definitions; to revise provisions relating to a state approved ignition interlock system, to revise provisions relating to an alcohol evaluation; to revise provisions relating to a court order and to revise provisions relating to a calibration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-11 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 11, 2014 Session Law Chapter 63 Effective: 07/01/2014 |
2014-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on March 5, 2014 |
2014-03-05 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2014-03-03 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2014-03-03 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2014-02-28 | Senate | to House |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Title apvd |
2014-02-28 | Senate | PASSED -- 31-4-0 |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2014-02-10 | House | to Senate |
2014-02-10 | House | Title apvd |
2014-02-10 | House | PASSED -- 61-7-2 |
2014-02-10 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2014-02-07 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 10, 2014 |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2014-02-05 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2014-01-24 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |