ID H0372 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2020 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

PERSI -- Amends existing law to provide for actuarial management personnel.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to provide for actuarial management personnel.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-17HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 15, 2020 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/2020
2020-03-12HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 11, 2020
2020-03-11HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2020-03-10SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2020-03-10SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2020-03-09HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2020-03-06HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2020-03-05Senateto House
2020-03-05SenateTitle apvd
2020-03-05SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 32-0-3
2020-02-28SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2020-02-27SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2020-02-07SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2020-02-07SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2020-02-06Houseto Senate
2020-02-06HouseTitle apvd
2020-02-06HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-0-2
2020-02-05HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2020-02-04HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2020-01-29HouseReported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources
2020-01-28HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback