ID H0369 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 17, 2020 Session Law Chapter 16 Effective: 02/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 17, 2020 Session Law Chapter 16 Effective: 02/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- INDUSTRIAL COMMISSION -- Relates to the appropriation to the Industrial Commission for fiscal year 2020.
Title
Relates to the appropriation to the Industrial Commission for fiscal year 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 17, 2020 Session Law Chapter 16 Effective: 02/17/2020 |
2020-02-17 | House | Delivered to Governor at 11:10 a.m. on February 14, 2020 |
2020-02-14 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-02-11 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-02-10 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-02-03 | House | to Senate |
2020-02-03 | House | Title apvd |
2020-02-03 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 57-13-0 |
2020-01-31 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 3, 2020 |
2020-01-30 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-29 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |