ID H0369 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FUNERAL AND CEMETERY MERCHANDISE AND SERVICES - Amends existing law to provide that licensed morticians and funeral directors shall designate the licensed funeral establishment responsible for merchandise or services under prearrangement sales and to provide that the licensed funeral establishment shall maintain all contracts and documents associated with prearrangement sales.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that licensed morticians and funeral directors shall designate the licensed funeral establishment responsible for merchandise or services under prearrangement sales and to provide that the licensed funeral establishment shall maintain all contracts and documents associated with prearrangement sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-08 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 17, 2016 Session Law Chapter 80 Effective: 07/01/2016 |
2016-03-16 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:50 a.m. on March 15, 2016 |
2016-03-15 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2016-03-11 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2016-03-10 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2016-03-09 | Senate | to House |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Title apvd |
2016-03-09 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2016-02-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2016-02-08 | House | to Senate |
2016-02-08 | House | Title apvd |
2016-02-08 | House | PASSED -- 70-0-0 |
2016-02-08 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2016-02-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2016-02-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2016-01-25 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2016-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |