ID H0350 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 9, 2020 Session Law Chapter 46 Effective: 03/09/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 9, 2020 Session Law Chapter 46 Effective: 03/09/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- Amends existing law to provide that the administrator of the Division of Public Works may promulgate rules and contract with a public or private entity for the rental of parking facilities in the Capitol Mall in certain instances.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that the administrator of the Division of Public Works may promulgate rules and contract with a public or private entity for the rental of parking facilities in the Capitol Mall in certain instances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 9, 2020 Session Law Chapter 46 Effective: 03/09/2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 6, 2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-03-04 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-03-02 | Senate | to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 23-9-3 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-01-30 | House | to Senate |
2020-01-30 | House | Title apvd |
2020-01-30 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-5-1 |
2020-01-29 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-28 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Commerce & Human Resources |
2020-01-22 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |