ID H0340 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - to Educ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - to Educ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to certain certificates.
Title
Amends existing law relating to education to revise provisions relating to certain certificates.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | to Educ | |
2011-04-06 | 1st rdg | |
2011-04-06 | Senate intro | |
2011-04-06 | to Senate | |
2011-04-06 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-06 | Cronin | |
2011-04-06 | 69-1-0 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke, Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb(McCoy), Burgoyne, Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Henderson, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Nonini, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Rusche, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Trail, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Marriott Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsor | |
2011-04-06 | PASSED | |
2011-04-06 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-06 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-06 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-05 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-05 | rec d/p | |
2011-04-05 | Rpt out | |
2011-04-01 | to Educ | |
2011-04-01 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-31 | to printing | |
2011-03-31 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-31 | House intro |