ID H0328 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- Appropriates $22,422,800 to the Department of Administration for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 140; provides a dedicated fund cash transfer; directs the health insurance plan for state employees; and provides legislative intent for use of funds for a specific purpose.
Title
Appropriates $22,422,800 to the Department of Administration for fiscal year 2018; limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 140; provides a dedicated fund cash transfer; directs the health insurance plan for state employees; and provides legislative intent for use of funds for a specific purpose.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 335 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:05 p.m. on March 31, 2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-29 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Read in full as required) -- PASSED 27-7-1 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Rules Suspended (2/3 Vote |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-29 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-29 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-29 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 55-13-2 |
2017-03-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-03-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-27 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-24 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |