ID H0326 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 334 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- DEPARTMENT OF ADMINISTRATION -- Appropriates an additional $5,500,000 from the Administration and Accounting Services Fund to the Department of Administration for fiscal year 2018.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $5,500,000 from the Administration and Accounting Services Fund to the Department of Administration for fiscal year 2018.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 334 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 12:05 p.m. on March 31, 2017
2017-03-29HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-29SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-29SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-29HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-28Senateto House
2017-03-28SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-28SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 30-5-0
2017-03-28SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2017-03-28SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-28SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2017-03-28SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-27Houseto Senate
2017-03-27HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-27HouseRules Suspended:
2017-03-27HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-24HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback