ID H0321 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 11, 2020 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Reported Signed by Governor on February 11, 2020 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: 07/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LIQUOR -- Amends existing law to clarify that it shall not be unlawful for certain persons to enter specified premises.
Title
Amends existing law to clarify that it shall not be unlawful for certain persons to enter specified premises.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on February 11, 2020 Session Law Chapter 9 Effective: 07/01/2020 |
2020-02-12 | House | Delivered to Governor at 12:10 p.m. on February 11, 2020 |
2020-02-11 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2020-02-06 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2020-02-05 | Senate | to House |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Title apvd |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 32-3-0 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2020-01-27 | House | to Senate |
2020-01-27 | House | Title apvd |
2020-01-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-1-2 |
2020-01-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-01-22 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2020-01-21 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2020-01-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2020-01-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |