ID H0321 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 04/11/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- LEGISLATURE -- Appropriates $125,000 from the General Fund to the Legislature for fiscal year 2017 to fund the State Employee Group Insurance and Benefits Committee; and provides reappropriation authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates $125,000 from the General Fund to the Legislature for fiscal year 2017 to fund the State Employee Group Insurance and Benefits Committee; and provides reappropriation authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 333 Effective: 04/11/2017
2017-03-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 12:05 p.m. on March 31, 2017
2017-03-29HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-29SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-29SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-28HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-28HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-27Senateto House
2017-03-27SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-27SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 35-0-0
2017-03-27SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2017-03-27SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-27SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2017-03-27SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-27Houseto Senate
2017-03-27HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-27HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 63-6-1
2017-03-24HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-23HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-22HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback