ID H0316 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-04 - to St Aff
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to levy elections to provide provisions relating to disclosures in elections in any taxing district that proposes to submit any question to electors that would authorize any levy.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to levy elections to provide provisions relating to disclosures in elections in any taxing district that proposes to submit any question to electors that would authorize any levy.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | to St Aff | |
2011-04-04 | 1st rdg | |
2011-04-04 | Senate intro | |
2011-04-04 | to Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-04 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 70-0-0 | |
2011-04-01 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-01 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-31 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-31 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-31 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-29 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-29 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-28 | to printing | |
2011-03-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-28 | House intro |