ID H0313 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

APPROPRIATIONS -- HEALTH AND WELFARE -- MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES/DIVISION OF MEDICAID -- Appropriates an additional $1,043,900 to the Children's Mental Health Program for fiscal year 2018; reduces the appropriation to the Children's Mental Health Program by $1,181,600 for fiscal year 2018; authorizes an additional 7 full-time equivalent positions; and provides for legislative intent for the Division of Medicaid.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates an additional $1,043,900 to the Children's Mental Health Program for fiscal year 2018; reduces the appropriation to the Children's Mental Health Program by $1,181,600 for fiscal year 2018; authorizes an additional 7 full-time equivalent positions; and provides for legislative intent for the Division of Medicaid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-11HouseReported Signed by Governor on April 11, 2017 Session Law Chapter 327 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-29HouseDelivered to Governor at 12:05 p.m. on March 31, 2017
2017-03-29HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-29SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-29SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-28HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-27HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-24Senateto House
2017-03-24SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-24SenateRead in full as required) -- PASSED 30-5-0
2017-03-24SenateRules Suspended (2/3 Vote
2017-03-24SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-24SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Finance
2017-03-24SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-23Houseto Senate
2017-03-23HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-23HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 56-14-0
2017-03-22HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-03-21HouseReported Printed; Filed for Second Reading
2017-03-21HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback