ID H0292 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 239 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 239 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $6,128,400 for the Regulatory Boards for fiscal year 2012; and limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 65.
Title
Appropriates $6,128,400 for the Regulatory Boards for fiscal year 2012; and limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 65.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 239 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-24 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-23 | to Fin | |
2011-03-23 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-23 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-22 | to Senate | |
2011-03-22 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-22 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 64-4-2 | |
2011-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-17 | to printing | |
2011-03-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-17 | House intro |