ID H0288 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-04 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
APPROPRIATIONS -- PUBLIC SCHOOLS -- FACILITIES DIVISION -- Appropriates $48,486,600 for the Public Schools Educational Support Program/Division of Facilities for fiscal year 2018; provides moneys for the Bond Levy Equalization Fund; specifies the amount of revenue to be distributed to the General Fund; and allows for the General Fund to be included in the year-end reconciliation, if necessary.
Title
Appropriates $48,486,600 for the Public Schools Educational Support Program/Division of Facilities for fiscal year 2018; provides moneys for the Bond Levy Equalization Fund; specifies the amount of revenue to be distributed to the General Fund; and allows for the General Fund to be included in the year-end reconciliation, if necessary.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-04 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 4, 2017 Session Law Chapter 256 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:25 a.m. on March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-23 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-22 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Finance |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-20 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-20 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-20 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2017-03-17 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |