ID H0276 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 04/05/11 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 04/05/11 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates an additional $3,367,800 to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2011; exempts the department from appropriation object and program transfer limitations for fiscal year 2011; appropriates $173,489,500 to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2012; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 1,556.93; and exempts the department from appropriation object and program transfer limitations for fiscal year 2012.
Title
Appropriates an additional $3,367,800 to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2011; exempts the department from appropriation object and program transfer limitations for fiscal year 2011; appropriates $173,489,500 to the Department of Correction for fiscal year 2012; limits the number of full-time equivalent positions to 1,556.93; and exempts the department from appropriation object and program transfer limitations for fiscal year 2012.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 192 Effective: 04/05/11 Sections 1 & 2; 07/01/11 All other sections | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-30 | To enrol | |
2011-03-29 | to House | |
2011-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 33-2-0 | |
2011-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-21 | to Fin | |
2011-03-21 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-21 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-18 | to Senate | |
2011-03-18 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-18 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 59-7-4 | |
2011-03-17 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-16 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-15 | to printing | |
2011-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-15 | House intro |