ID H0270 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-15 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
BOND AND LEVY ELECTIONS -- Adds to existing law to establish the Government Noninterference in Bond and Levy Elections Act.
Title
Adds to existing law to establish the Government Noninterference in Bond and Levy Elections Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-14 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-14 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported Printed; Filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |