ID H0270 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 233 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 233 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to existing law relating to rulemaking by the director of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture to provide procedures in the event rules of the director are more stringent than federal law or regulations or propose to regulate an activity not regulated by the federal government.
Title
Adds to existing law relating to rulemaking by the director of the Idaho State Department of Agriculture to provide procedures in the event rules of the director are more stringent than federal law or regulations or propose to regulate an activity not regulated by the federal government.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 233 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-0-1 | |
2011-03-25 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-25 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-24 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-22 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-22 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-22 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-21 | to Senate | |
2011-03-21 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-21 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2011-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-17 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-15 | to Agric Aff | |
2011-03-15 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-14 | to printing | |
2011-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-14 | House intro |