ID H0251 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-14 - U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HIGHWAYS -- Amends existing law to revise the definition of “maintenance”.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the definition of “maintenance”.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | House | U.C. to be returned to Transportation & Defense Committee |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-03-07 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |
Subjects
Idaho State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.idaho.gov/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/H0251/ |
Text | https://legislature.idaho.gov/wp-content/uploads/sessioninfo/2017/legislation/H0251.pdf |