ID H0249 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 157 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 157 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates $6,102,800 to the Department of Finance for fiscal year 2012; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 61.
Title
Appropriates $6,102,800 to the Department of Finance for fiscal year 2012; and limits the number of authorized full-time equivalent positions to 61.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 157 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-31 | Delivered to Governor on 03/30 | |
2011-03-30 | To Governor | |
2011-03-29 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-28 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-28 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-25 | To enrol | |
2011-03-24 | to House | |
2011-03-24 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-24 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-17 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-17 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-16 | to Fin | |
2011-03-16 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-16 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-15 | to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2011-03-14 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-11 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-11 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-10 | to printing | |
2011-03-10 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-10 | House intro |