ID H0235 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 188 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 188 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho Criminal Gang Enforcement Act to further define a term, to revise definitions and to increase certain punishments.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Idaho Criminal Gang Enforcement Act to further define a term, to revise definitions and to increase certain punishments.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 188 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-30 | To enrol | |
2011-03-29 | to House | |
2011-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-29 | Lodge & McGee | |
2011-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 34-1-0 AYES -- Andreason, Bair, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Davis, Fulcher, Goedde, Hammond, Heider, Hill, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKague, Mortimer, Nuxoll, Pearce, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett, Tippets, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- McKenzie Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsors | |
2011-03-23 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-22 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-22 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-15 | to Jud | |
2011-03-15 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-15 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-14 | to Senate | |
2011-03-14 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-14 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 69-0-1 | |
2011-03-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-10 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-10 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-08 | to Jud | |
2011-03-08 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-07 | to printing | |
2011-03-07 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-07 | House intro |