ID H0213 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 230 Effective: 01/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 6 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-06 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 230 Effective: 01/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to define "sales price" for sales and use tax purposes to clarify that sales price shall not include a gratuity or tip received when paid to the service provider for a meal.
Title
Amends existing law to define "sales price" for sales and use tax purposes to clarify that sales price shall not include a gratuity or tip received when paid to the service provider for a meal.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 230 Effective: 01/01/11 | |
2011-04-06 | Delivered to Governor on 04/05 | |
2011-04-05 | To Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-04 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-01 | To enrol | |
2011-03-31 | to House | |
2011-03-31 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-31 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 31-0-4 | |
2011-03-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-11 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-03-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-11 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-10 | to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-10 | Bayer & Jaquet | |
2011-03-10 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 65-0-5 AYES -- Anderson, Andrus, Barbieri, Barrett, Bateman, Bayer, Bedke(Bedke), Bell, Bilbao, Black, Block, Bolz, Boyle, Buckner-Webb, Burgoyne, Chew, Collins, Crane, Cronin, DeMordaunt, Ellsworth, Eskridge, Gibbs(Wheeler), Guthrie, Hagedorn, Hart, Hartgen, Harwood, Higgins, Jaquet, Killen, King, Lacey, Lake, Loertscher, Luker, Marriott, McGeachin, McMillan, Moyle, Nesset, Nielsen, Palmer, Patrick, Pence, Perry, Raybould, Ringo, Roberts, Schaefer, Shepherd, Shirley, Simpson, Sims, Smith(30), Smith(24), Stevenson, Takasugi(Batt), Thayn, Thompson, Vander Woude, Wills, Wood(27), Wood(35), Mr. Speaker NAYS -- None Absent and excused -- Chadderdon(Chadderdon), Henderson, Nonini, Rusche, Trail Floor Sponsors | |
2011-03-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-02 | to Rev/Tax | |
2011-03-02 | Rpt prt | |
2011-03-01 | to printing | |
2011-03-01 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-01 | House intro |