ID H0191 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 276 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-11 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 276 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to authorize pari-mutuel betting on the result of a live horse race meet at a facility not located on the grounds where the wagering occurs under certain circumstances, to provide procedures, to provide fees and to provide for the creation of the Live Horse Race Purse Distribution Fund and to provide for distribution of excess proceeds from the fund.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize pari-mutuel betting on the result of a live horse race meet at a facility not located on the grounds where the wagering occurs under certain circumstances, to provide procedures, to provide fees and to provide for the creation of the Live Horse Race Purse Distribution Fund and to provide for distribution of excess proceeds from the fund.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-11 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 276 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-04-07 | Delivered to Governor on 04/08 | |
2011-04-07 | To Governor | |
2011-04-07 | Pres signed | |
2011-04-07 | Sp signed | |
2011-04-07 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-04-06 | To enrol | |
2011-04-05 | to House | |
2011-04-05 | Title apvd | |
2011-04-05 | Lodge & Winder | |
2011-04-05 | 26-9-0 AYES -- Andreason, Bilyeu, Bock, Brackett, Broadsword, Cameron, Corder, Darrington, Goedde, Hammond, Keough, LeFavour, Lodge, Malepeai, McGee, McKague, Nuxoll, Schmidt, Siddoway, Smyser, Stegner, Stennett, Toryanski, Vick, Werk, Winder NAYS -- Bair, Davis, Fulcher, Heider, Hill, McKenzie, Mortimer, Pearce, Tippets Absent and excused -- None Floor Sponsors | |
2011-04-05 | PASSED | |
2011-04-05 | Rls susp | |
2011-04-05 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-04-05 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-04-04 | rec d/p | |
2011-04-04 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-18 | to St Aff | |
2011-03-18 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-18 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-17 | to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-17 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 40-29-1 | |
2011-03-15 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-15 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-14 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-14 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-23 | to St Aff | |
2011-02-23 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-22 | to printing | |
2011-02-22 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-22 | House intro |