ID H0184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AUDITS OF LOCAL GOVERNMENTAL ENTITIES -- Amends existing law to revise the expenditure levels of local governmental entities subject to audits.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the expenditure levels of local governmental entities subject to audits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2019 Session Law Chapter 203 Effective: 07/01/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 25, 2019 |
2019-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 29-5-1 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 65-0-5 |
2019-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-27 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-26 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-22 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation |
2019-02-21 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |