ID H0181 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 138 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 138 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LOCAL GOVERNMENT INVESTMENT POOL -- Amends existing law to authorize public charter school participation in the Local Government Investment Pool.
Title
Amends existing law to authorize public charter school participation in the Local Government Investment Pool.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 138 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:50 a.m. on March 21, 2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-16 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-14 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 69-0-1 |
2017-02-28 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-27 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |