ID H0179 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2015 Session Law Chapter 206 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2015 Session Law Chapter 206 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HOSPITALS - Amends and adds to existing law to provide investment limitations for hospital treasurers.
Title
Amends and adds to existing law to provide investment limitations for hospital treasurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 1, 2015 Session Law Chapter 206 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-30 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:58 a.m. on March 27, 2015 |
2015-03-27 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-25 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-24 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-24 | Senate | PASSED -- 34-0-1 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-03-06 | House | to Senate |
2015-03-06 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-06 | House | PASSED -- 57-7-6 |
2015-03-06 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-03-05 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-04 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |