ID H0179 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 183 Effective: 07/21/11 Section 5; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-05 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 183 Effective: 07/21/11 Section 5; 07/01/11 All other sections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to unauthorized insurers and surplus lines to provide that certain code sections apply only when the insured's home state is Idaho; to provide that a certain search requirement is not required in certain circumstances, to provide record maintenance requirements, to provide restrictions relating to insurers with which surplus line brokers may insure, to grant the director certain rulemaking authority and to provide a penalty; to grant the director the authority to participate in a certain database; and to revise provisions relating to a tax on surplus lines.
Title
Amends existing law relating to unauthorized insurers and surplus lines to provide that certain code sections apply only when the insured's home state is Idaho; to provide that a certain search requirement is not required in certain circumstances, to provide record maintenance requirements, to provide restrictions relating to insurers with which surplus line brokers may insure, to grant the director certain rulemaking authority and to provide a penalty; to grant the director the authority to participate in a certain database; and to revise provisions relating to a tax on surplus lines.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-11 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 183 Effective: 07/21/11 Section 5; 07/01/11 All other sections | |
2011-04-04 | Delivered to Governor on 04/01 | |
2011-04-01 | To Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-30 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-30 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-30 | To enrol | |
2011-03-29 | to House | |
2011-03-29 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-29 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-21 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-21 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-18 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-18 | Rpt out | |
2011-03-14 | to Com/HuRes | |
2011-03-14 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-14 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-11 | to Senate | |
2011-03-11 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-11 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 67-0-3 | |
2011-03-07 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-07 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-04 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-18 | to Bus | |
2011-02-18 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-17 | to printing | |
2011-02-17 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-17 | House intro |