ID H0171 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
FISHWAYS -- Amends existing law to provide that specified law regarding fishways shall not apply to the Hells Canyon Hydroelectric Project.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that specified law regarding fishways shall not apply to the Hells Canyon Hydroelectric Project.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 61 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-24 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 24, 2017 Session Law Chapter 137 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:50 a.m. on March 21, 2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-17 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-15 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 29-6-0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Resources & Environment |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-27 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-27 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 61-9-0 |
2017-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 27, 2017 |
2017-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-22 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Resources & Conservation |
2017-02-14 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |