ID H0168 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - SECTION 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

MOTOR VEHICLES -- Adds to and amends existing law for the Idaho Transportation Department and local authorities to designate routes and issue permits for vehicles with gross weights between 105,501 and 129,000 pounds.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adds to and amends existing law for the Idaho Transportation Department and local authorities to designate routes and issue permits for vehicles with gross weights between 105,501 and 129,000 pounds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22HouseSECTION 5
2019-03-22HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2019 Session Law Chapter 180 Effective: 07/01/2019 SECTION 1, 2, 5, & 6; 06/30/2021 SECTION 3 & 4; 06/30/2021 Sunset Clause
2019-03-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 22, 2019
2019-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2019-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2019-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2019-03-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2019-03-19HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2019-03-18Senateto House
2019-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2019-03-18SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2
2019-03-13SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2019-03-12SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation
2019-03-04SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2019-03-01Houseto Senate
2019-03-01HouseTitle apvd
2019-03-01HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-0-6
2019-02-28HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-27HouseU.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day
2019-02-26HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2019-02-25HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2019-02-18HouseReported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense
2019-02-15HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback