ID H0168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - SECTION 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - SECTION 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Adds to and amends existing law for the Idaho Transportation Department and local authorities to designate routes and issue permits for vehicles with gross weights between 105,501 and 129,000 pounds.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law for the Idaho Transportation Department and local authorities to designate routes and issue permits for vehicles with gross weights between 105,501 and 129,000 pounds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | SECTION 5 |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 22, 2019 Session Law Chapter 180 Effective: 07/01/2019 SECTION 1, 2, 5, & 6; 06/30/2021 SECTION 3 & 4; 06/30/2021 Sunset Clause |
2019-03-25 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:20 a.m. on March 22, 2019 |
2019-03-22 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2019-03-19 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2019-03-18 | Senate | to House |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Title apvd |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Transportation |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2019-03-01 | House | to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Title apvd |
2019-03-01 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 64-0-6 |
2019-02-28 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-27 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2019-02-26 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2019-02-25 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2019-02-18 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2019-02-15 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |