ID H0153 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2017 Session Law Chapter 48 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FOREST LANDS TAXATION -- Amends existing law to extend a sunset date on the use of certain criteria regarding timber productivity valuation and forest management cost allowances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to extend a sunset date on the use of certain criteria regarding timber productivity valuation and forest management cost allowances.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 1, 2017 Session Law Chapter 48 Effective: Retroactive to 01/01/2017
2017-03-01HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:55 a.m. on February 28, 2017
2017-02-28HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-02-27SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-02-27SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-02-27HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-02-27HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-02-27Senateto House
2017-02-27SenateTitle apvd
2017-02-27SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-02-24SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-02-24SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Local Government & Taxation
2017-02-22SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-02-21Houseto Senate
2017-02-21HouseTitle apvd
2017-02-21HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0
2017-02-20HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-17HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Revenue & Taxation
2017-02-10HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback