ID H0153 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-22 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 116 Effective: 03/22/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Amends existing law relating to water quality to provide a policy relating to Tier I, II and III protections associated with water quality; to provide for an antidegradation review associated with the issuance of certain general permits, to provide that the department may presume certain discharges are insignificant or that certain pollution controls are the least degrading alternative if supported by the permit record; to provide for the identification of Tier II waters; to provide for the determination of appropriate levels of protection; to provide that the department shall determine whether certain activities or discharges are insignificant; and to provide for the approval of specified rules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law relating to water quality to provide a policy relating to Tier I, II and III protections associated with water quality; to provide for an antidegradation review associated with the issuance of certain general permits, to provide that the department may presume certain discharges are insignificant or that certain pollution controls are the least degrading alternative if supported by the permit record; to provide for the identification of Tier II waters; to provide for the determination of appropriate levels of protection; to provide that the department shall determine whether certain activities or discharges are insignificant; and to provide for the approval of specified rules.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-22 Governor signed Session Law Chapter 116 Effective: 03/22/11
2011-03-18 Delivered to Governor on 03/17
2011-03-17 To Governor
2011-03-16 Pres signed
2011-03-15 Sp signed
2011-03-15 Rpt enrol
2011-03-14 To enrol
2011-03-11 to House
2011-03-11 Title apvd
2011-03-11 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 26-6-3
2011-03-09 to 3rd rdg
2011-03-09 2nd rdg
2011-03-08 to 2nd rdg
2011-03-08 rec d/p
2011-03-08 Rpt out
2011-02-24 to Res/Env
2011-02-24 1st rdg
2011-02-24 Senate intro
2011-02-23 to Senate
2011-02-23 Title apvd
2011-02-23 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 54-14-2
2011-02-18 to 3rd rdg
2011-02-18 2nd rdg
2011-02-17 to 2nd rdg
2011-02-17 rec d/p
2011-02-17 Rpt out
2011-02-14 to Env
2011-02-14 Rpt prt
2011-02-11 to printing
2011-02-11 1st rdg
2011-02-11 House intro

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback