ID H0148 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on March 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-16 - Governor signed Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/11
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to local land use planning; to provide that one purpose of local land use planning is to encourage the protection of land uses for the production of food, fibre and minerals as well as the economic benefits they provide to the community; to provide that comprehensive plans shall consider the compatibility of land uses, to provide that agriculture shall be one component upon which comprehensive plans shall be based; to provide that the governing board shall analyze proposed changes to zoning ordinances to ensure that they are not in conflict with the policies of the comprehensive plan; and to provide that local governments are encouraged to post notices of hearings relating to requests for special use permits on their official websites.
Title
Amends existing law relating to local land use planning; to provide that one purpose of local land use planning is to encourage the protection of land uses for the production of food, fibre and minerals as well as the economic benefits they provide to the community; to provide that comprehensive plans shall consider the compatibility of land uses, to provide that agriculture shall be one component upon which comprehensive plans shall be based; to provide that the governing board shall analyze proposed changes to zoning ordinances to ensure that they are not in conflict with the policies of the comprehensive plan; and to provide that local governments are encouraged to post notices of hearings relating to requests for special use permits on their official websites.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-16 | Governor signed Session Law Chapter 89 Effective: 07/01/11 | |
2011-03-15 | Delivered to Governor on 03/14 | |
2011-03-14 | To Governor | |
2011-03-11 | Pres signed | |
2011-03-10 | Sp signed | |
2011-03-10 | Rpt enrol | |
2011-03-09 | To enrol | |
2011-03-08 | to House | |
2011-03-08 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-08 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 35-0-0 | |
2011-03-04 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-03-04 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-03-03 | rec d/p | |
2011-03-03 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-28 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-02-28 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-28 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-25 | to Senate | |
2011-02-25 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-25 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 66-0-4 | |
2011-02-24 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-24 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-23 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-23 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-23 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-14 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-02-14 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-11 | to printing | |
2011-02-11 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-11 | House intro |