ID H0135 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-17 - Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
FARM EQUIPMENT AGREEMENTS -- Amends existing law to revise certain supplier violation provisions; to provide that the fact a dealer agreement allows an event, act or omission does not control whether such event, act or omission resulted in a substantial change in the dealer's competitive circumstances; to provide that a supplier shall provide written notice to an equipment dealer of any substantial change in the dealer's competitive circumstances; and to provide for content of the notice.
Title
Amends existing law to revise certain supplier violation provisions; to provide that the fact a dealer agreement allows an event, act or omission does not control whether such event, act or omission resulted in a substantial change in the dealer's competitive circumstances; to provide that a supplier shall provide written notice to an equipment dealer of any substantial change in the dealer's competitive circumstances; and to provide for content of the notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-17 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-03-16 | House | to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | Title apvd |
2017-03-16 | House | Rules Suspended: |
2017-03-16 | House | Read second time as amended; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time as amended; filed for Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2017-03-14 | House | Amendments Referred to the JRA for Printing |
2017-03-14 | House | Reported out without recommendation as amended |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred to the Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported out of Committee, Recommend place on General Orders |
2017-02-13 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2017-02-10 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |