ID H0127 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2013 Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-29 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2013 Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law relating to the Bureau of Occupational Licenses to provide that the bureau may collect and pay certain fees relating to criminal background checks.
Title
Amends existing law relating to the Bureau of Occupational Licenses to provide that the bureau may collect and pay certain fees relating to criminal background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-29 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 29, 2013 Session Law Chapter 178 Effective: 07/01/13 |
2013-03-26 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:45 a.m. on March 25, 2013 |
2013-03-25 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2013-03-20 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2013-03-19 | Senate | to House |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Title apvd |
2013-03-19 | Senate | PASSED -- 35-0-0 |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2013-02-18 | House | to Senate |
2013-02-18 | House | Title apvd |
2013-02-18 | House | PASSED -- 65-4-1 |
2013-02-18 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2013-02-15 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2013-02-11 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Business |
2013-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |