ID H0126 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - to Loc Gov
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-16 - to Loc Gov
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends existing law to revise the income tax credit available to taxpayers for employing new employees.
Title
Amends existing law to revise the income tax credit available to taxpayers for employing new employees.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-02-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-02-16 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-16 | Senate intro | |
2011-02-15 | to Senate | |
2011-02-15 | Title apvd | |
2011-02-15 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 64-3-3 | |
2011-02-11 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-11 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-10 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-10 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-10 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-09 | to Rev/Tax | |
2011-02-09 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-08 | to printing | |
2011-02-08 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-08 | House intro |