ID H0121 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-27 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 185 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

DRIVING BUSINESSES -- Amends existing law to revise licensing provisions for driving businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to revise licensing provisions for driving businesses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-27HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 27, 2017 Session Law Chapter 185 Effective: 07/01/2017
2017-03-23HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 22, 2017
2017-03-22HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2017-03-21SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2017-03-21SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2017-03-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2017-03-17HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2017-03-16Senateto House
2017-03-16SenateTitle apvd
2017-03-16SenateRead third time in full -- PASSED 34-0-1
2017-03-10SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2017-03-09SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2017-03-03SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Commerce & Human Resources
2017-03-03SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2017-03-02Houseto Senate
2017-03-02HouseTitle apvd
2017-03-02HouseRead Third Time in Full -- PASSED 68-1-1
2017-03-01HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2017-02-28HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2017-02-09HouseReported Printed and Referred to State Affairs
2017-02-08HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback