ID H0121 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

CRIMINAL PROCEDURE - Amends existing law to remove a provision relating to the penalty imposed when certain language is used; to revise the penalty for flooding a highway; and to revise the penalty for certain smoking violations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amends existing law to remove a provision relating to the penalty imposed when certain language is used; to revise the penalty for flooding a highway; and to revise the penalty for certain smoking violations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30HouseReported Signed by Governor on March 30, 2015 Session Law Chapter 198 Effective: 07/01/2015
2015-03-25HouseDelivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 24, 2015
2015-03-24HouseReturned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor
2015-03-23SenateSigned by President; returned to House
2015-03-23SenateReceived from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker
2015-03-20HouseReported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate
2015-03-19HouseReturned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling
2015-03-18Senateto House
2015-03-18SenateTitle apvd
2015-03-18SenatePASSED -- 31-3-1
2015-03-18SenateRead third time in full
2015-03-17SenateRead second time; filed for Third Reading
2015-03-16SenateReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading
2015-02-25SenateIntroduced, read first time; referred to: Judiciary & Rules
2015-02-25SenateReceived from the House passed; filed for first reading
2015-02-24Houseto Senate
2015-02-24HouseTitle apvd
2015-02-24HousePASSED -- 63-2-5
2015-02-24HouseRead Third Time in Full
2015-02-23HouseRead second time; Filed for Third Reading
2015-02-20HouseReported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading
2015-02-13HouseReported Printed and Referred to Judiciary, Rules, & Administration
2015-02-12HouseIntroduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing

Subjects


Idaho State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback