ID H0115 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 81 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 81 Effective: 07/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS -- Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding licensure background checks.
Title
Amends existing law to revise provisions regarding licensure background checks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 20, 2017 Session Law Chapter 81 Effective: 07/01/2017 |
2017-03-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:15 a.m. on March 17, 2017 |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2017-03-13 | Senate | to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Title apvd |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 33-0-2 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Health & Welfare |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2017-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- PASSED 66-0-4 |
2017-02-21 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2017-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Health & Welfare |
2017-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |