ID H0114 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2015 Session Law Chapter 101 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-25 - Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2015 Session Law Chapter 101 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PURE SEED LAW - Amends existing law to provide for the applicability of specified law to the cultivation, production and processing of seeds and to prohibit regulation by political subdivisions relating to the cultivation, production and processing of seeds.
Title
Amends existing law to provide for the applicability of specified law to the cultivation, production and processing of seeds and to prohibit regulation by political subdivisions relating to the cultivation, production and processing of seeds.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-25 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on March 25, 2015 Session Law Chapter 101 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:17 a.m. on March 23, 2015 |
2015-03-23 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-18 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2015-03-17 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-17 | Senate | PASSED -- 29-5-1 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read third time in full |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Retained on calendar |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: Agricultural Affairs |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-02-26 | House | to Senate |
2015-02-26 | House | Title apvd |
2015-02-26 | House | PASSED -- 64-3-3 |
2015-02-26 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-02-25 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-24 | House | U.C. to place at bottom of third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-23 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-20 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-19 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Agricultural Affairs |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |