ID H0113 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 07/01/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PARENT AND CHILD - Adds to existing law to provide the parental right to direct the care, custody and control of children; to provide the parental right to direct the education of children; to restrict interference with fundamental parental rights and to provide that this act shall not invalidate the Child Protective Act, to authorize a claim, defense and appropriate relief and to provide for attorney's fees.
Title
Adds to existing law to provide the parental right to direct the care, custody and control of children; to provide the parental right to direct the education of children; to restrict interference with fundamental parental rights and to provide that this act shall not invalidate the Child Protective Act, to authorize a claim, defense and appropriate relief and to provide for attorney's fees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 2, 2015 Session Law Chapter 219 Effective: 07/01/2015 |
2015-04-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:23 a.m. on March 31, 2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2015-03-26 | House | to enrol |
2015-03-26 | House | Title apvd |
2015-03-26 | House | Trujillo |
2015-03-26 | House | 56-12-2 AYES -- Anderson, Anderst, Andrus, Barbieri, Bateman, Batt, Bell, Beyeler, Boyle, Burtenshaw, Chaney, Cheatham, Clow, Collins, Crane, Dayley, DeMordaunt, Dixon, Gestrin, Gibbs, Harris, Hartgen, Hixon, Holtzclaw, Horman, Kauffman, Kerby, Loertscher, Luker, Malek, McDonald, McMillan, Mendive, Miller, Monks, Moyle, Nate, Nielsen, Nye, Packer, Palmer, Perry, Raybould, Redman, Romrell, Rudolph, Scott, Shepherd, Sims, Thompson, Troy, Trujillo, VanOrden, Wills, Youngblood, Mr. Speaker NAYS -- Chew, Erpelding, Gannon, Jordan, King, Kloc, McCrostie, Pence, Rubel, Rusche, Smith, Wintrow Absent -- Vander Woude, Wood Floor Sponsor |
2015-03-26 | House | PASSED |
2015-03-26 | House | Rules Suspended: Ayes 63 Nays 0 Abs/Excd 7, read three times |
2015-03-26 | House | Read second time as amended in Senate; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Read first time as amended in Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-25 | House | Reported Engrossed; Filed for First Reading of Engrossed Bills |
2015-03-24 | House | Bills as Amended Referred to JRA for Engrossing |
2015-03-24 | House | House Concurred in Senate Amendments |
2015-03-24 | House | Returned from the Senate Amended; Held at Desk |
2015-03-23 | Senate | to House |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Title apvd |
2015-03-23 | Senate | PASSED -- 27-7-1 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Read third time as amended in the Senate |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Read second time as amended in the Senate, filed for Third Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read first time as amended in the Senate; Filed for Second Reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendments reported printed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Reported out as amended; filed for first reading |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Amendments ordered printed |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Placed in the Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Reported out of committee; to 14th Order for amendment |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2015-02-25 | House | to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Title apvd |
2015-02-25 | House | PASSED -- 37-31-2 |
2015-02-25 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2015-02-24 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar one legislative day |
2015-02-23 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2015-02-20 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2015-02-12 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2015-02-11 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |