ID H0110 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR VEHICLES -- Amends existing law to provide that a motor vehicle originally manufactured without a bracket, device or other means to display and secure a front license plate shall be allowed to display one plate attached to the rear of the vehicle.
Title
Amends existing law to provide that a motor vehicle originally manufactured without a bracket, device or other means to display and secure a front license plate shall be allowed to display one plate attached to the rear of the vehicle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Filed in Office of the Chief Clerk |
2017-02-09 | House | Read Third Time in Full -- FAILED 28-42-0 |
2017-02-08 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2017-02-07 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2017-02-06 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to Transportation & Defense |
2017-02-03 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |