ID H0104 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2021 Session Law Chapter 150 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2021 Session Law Chapter 150 Effective: 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
INDEPENDENT EXPENDITURES -- Amends existing law to require certain disclosures.
Title
Amends existing law to require certain disclosures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | House | Reported Signed by Governor on April 9, 2021 Session Law Chapter 150 Effective: 07/01/2021 |
2021-04-09 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:14 a.m. on April 8, 2021 |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned Signed by the President; Ordered Transmitted to Governor |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by President; returned to House |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Received from the House enrolled/signed by Speaker |
2021-04-07 | House | Reported Enrolled; Signed by Speaker; Transmitted to Senate |
2021-04-07 | House | Returned from Senate Passed; to JRA for Enrolling |
2021-04-06 | Senate | to House |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Title apvd |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Read third time in full -- PASSED 35-0-0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Read second time; filed for Third Reading |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation; Filed for second reading |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, read first time; referred to: State Affairs |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Received from the House passed; filed for first reading |
2021-02-22 | House | to Senate |
2021-02-22 | House | Title apvd |
2021-02-22 | House | Previously Read in Full -- PASSED 70-0-0 |
2021-02-22 | House | Read Third Time in Full |
2021-02-19 | House | U.C. to hold place on third reading calendar until Monday, February 22, 2021 |
2021-02-18 | House | Read second time; Filed for Third Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Reported out of Committee with Do Pass Recommendation, Filed for Second Reading |
2021-02-09 | House | Reported Printed and Referred to State Affairs |
2021-02-08 | House | Introduced, read first time, referred to JRA for Printing |