ID H0097 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - to Loc Gov
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - to Loc Gov
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adds to and amends existing law relating to urban renewal and local economic development to provide that an urban renewal plan planned or approved shall be limited to a single project and shall include a termination date; to provide for distribution of certain revenue and to define a term; and to provide that a certain plan be consistent with provisions of section 50-2008, Idaho Code.
Title
Adds to and amends existing law relating to urban renewal and local economic development to provide that an urban renewal plan planned or approved shall be limited to a single project and shall include a termination date; to provide for distribution of certain revenue and to define a term; and to provide that a certain plan be consistent with provisions of section 50-2008, Idaho Code.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-03-02 | 1st rdg | |
2011-03-02 | Senate intro | |
2011-03-01 | to Senate | |
2011-03-01 | Title apvd | |
2011-03-01 | 3rd rdg -- PASSED -- 43-26-1 | |
2011-02-18 | to 3rd rdg | |
2011-02-18 | 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-17 | to 2nd rdg | |
2011-02-17 | rec d/p | |
2011-02-17 | Rpt out | |
2011-02-04 | to Loc Gov | |
2011-02-04 | Rpt prt | |
2011-02-03 | to printing | |
2011-02-03 | 1st rdg | |
2011-02-03 | House intro |